Docket for 20-1650
 | |
|
May 24 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 21 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 22 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2021. | | | Jul 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2021 to August 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 20 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 25, 2021. | | | Aug 25 2021 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. | | | Sep 09 2021 | Reply of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Sep 30 2021 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Oct 22 2021 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Carlos Concepcion. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 01 2021 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Nov 15 2021 | Brief of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 17 2021 | ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, January 19, 2022. | | | Nov 17 2021 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit. | | | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Drug Policy Alliance and The Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of FAMM, The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and the National Association of Federal Defenders filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of The Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic; A New Way of Life Reentry Project filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Dr. Karen Swanson, Dr. Byron R. Johnson, and Dr. Sung Joon Jang filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute, American Civil Liberties Union, ACLU of Massachusetts, and Southern Poverty Law Center filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of American Conservative Union Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, et al., filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law Scholars filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 06 2021 | The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. | | | Dec 06 2021 | The record from the U.S.D.C. Dist. of Massachusetts is electronic and located on Pacer, the Sealed Appendix is filed electronically. | | | Dec 14 2021 | CIRCULATED | | | Dec 15 2021 | Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed) | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Jan 07 2022 | Reply of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 19 2022 | Argued. For petitioner: Charles L. McCloud, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. | | | Jun 27 2022 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Breyer, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Alito and Barrett, JJ., joined. | | | Jul 29 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED | | |
|