Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1644
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1644
Title:Devon Archer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3727)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Devon Archer
Blanket Consent
Jun 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2021.
Jun 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Procedure Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2021 to August 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 25, 2021.
Aug 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2021 to September 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 24, 2021.
Sep 24 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 13 2021Reply of petitioner Devon Archer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Lane Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10001

mlschwartz@bsfllp.com
(212) 446-2300
Party name: Devon Archer
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brandon Lee Arnold
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, NW, 4th Flr
Washington, DC 20006

barnold@robbinsrussell.com
2027754500
Party name: Procedure Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543