Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1643
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1643
Title:Arthur Baisley, Petitioner
v.
International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Docketed:May 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50319)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2021.
Jul 26 2021Brief of respondent International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 16 2021Reply of petitioner Arthur Baisley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frank Dawson Garrison IV
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

fdg@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: Arthur Baisley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Ann Roma
    Counsel of Record
Guerrieri, Bartos & Roma, PC
1900 M Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

eroma@geclaw.com
202-624-7400
Party name: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543