Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1631
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1631
Vide 20-1654
Title:Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
Implicit, LLC, et al.
Docketed:May 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1173, 2020-1174)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief of petitioner Apple Inc. in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Debra J. McComas
    Counsel of Record
Haynes & Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue
Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75219

debbie.mccomas@haynesboone.com
214-651-5375
Party name: Apple Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrew, Acting Under Secretary of Commercie for Intellectual Property and Director, US Patent and Trade Office Hirshfeld

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543