Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1617
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1617
Title:Matthew Earley, Petitioner
v.
Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:May 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1816)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
May 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hirshfeld, Drew to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew EarleyP.O. Box 213
Allenwood, NJ 08720

732-528-9201
Party name: Matthew Earley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Hirshfeld, Drew

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543