Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1606
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1606
Title:Brett Hendrickson, Petitioner
v.
AFSCME Council 18, et al.
Docketed:May 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2018)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent AFSCME Council 18 to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Michelle Lujan Grisham, Hector Balderas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 27 2021Response Requested. (Due August 26, 2021)
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2021 to September 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2021, for all respondents.
Sep 24 2021Brief of respondent AFSCME Council 18 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2021Response to petition from respondents Michelle Lujan Grisham, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Reply of petitioner Brett Hendrickson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Ste. 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Brett Hendrickson
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: AFSCME Council 18
Alfred Alexander Park
    Counsel of Record
Park & Associates, LLC
3840 Masthead Street NE
Albuquerque, NM 87109

apark@parklawnm.com
505-246-2805
Party name: Michelle Lujan Grisham, Hector Balderas
Lawrence M MarcusPark & Associates, L.L.C.
3840 Masthead Street N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87107

lmarcus@parklawnm.com
505-360-1338
Party name: Michelle Lujan Grisham, Hector Balderas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543