Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1603
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1603
Title:Susan Bennett, Petitioner
v.
American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees, Council 31, AFL-CIO, et al.
Docketed:May 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1621)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents Kwame Raoul, Andrea Waintroob, Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr., Lynne Sered, and Lara Shayne to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 15 2021Waiver of right of respondents AFSCME Council 31, AFL-CIO; AFSCME Local 672 to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jun 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40 to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 27 2021Response Requested. (Due August 26, 2021)
Aug 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2021 to September 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 27, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Joanne Troesch, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2021Brief of respondents AFSCME Council 31, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Brief of respondents Kwame Raoul, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioner Susan Bennett filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 West Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Susan Bennett
Attorneys for Respondents
Jacob Raffel Karabell
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jkarabell@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: AFSCME Council 31, AFL-CIO; AFSCME Local 672
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

Jane.Notz@ilag.gov
312-814-5376
Party name: Kwame Raoul, Andrea Waintroob, Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr., Lynne Sered, and Lara Shayne
Frank Henry BieszczatOffice of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

frank.bieszczat@ilag.gov
312-814-2234
Party name: Kwame Raoul, Andrea Waintroob, Judy Biggert, Gilbert O'Brien, Jr., Lynne Sered, and Lara Shayne
Caitlin F SatterlyHodges, Loizzi, Eisenhammer, Rodick & Kohn LLP
401 SW Water Street
Suite 106
Peoria, IL 61602

fsatterly@hlerk.com
309-671-9000
Party name: Moline-Coal Valley School District No. 40
Other
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JAbernathy@freedomfoundation.com
3609563482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Joanne Troesch and Ifeoma Nkemdi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543