Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1599
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1599
Title:John Doe 7, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chiquita Brands International, Inc.
Docketed:May 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11494)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John Doe 7, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Chiquita Brands International, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 02 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Alabama, American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, American Civil Liberties Union of Georgia, Center for Constitutional Rights, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Center for Justice and filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2021Response Requested. (Due July 8, 2021)
Jun 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2021 to August 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 9, 2021.
Jul 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Crime Victim Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Seth Katsuya Endo, Helen Hershkoff, Jennifer A. Kreder, David I. Levine, Noah Novogrodsky, Portia Pedro, Beth Stephens, Susan Sturm filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Partners in Justice International and Center for Victims of Torture filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: John Doe 7, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Lawrence Cioffi
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome
201 East Fifth Street
Suite 1700
Cincinnati, OH 45202

cioffi@blankrome.com
5133628701
Party name: Chiquita Brands International, Inc.
Other
Paul G. Cassell
    Counsel of Record
Utah Appellate Project - S.J. Quinney College of Law at the University of Utah
383 S. University St.
Salt Lake City, UT 84112

cassellp@law.utah.edu
8015855202
Party name: National Crime Victim Law Institute
Christina Georgia Hioureas
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

hioureas@gmail.com
6469275507
Party name: Partners in Justice International and Center for Victims of Torture
Ariel N. Lavinbuk
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, N.W.
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

alavinbuk@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Seth Katsuya Endo, Helen Hershkoff, Jennifer A. Kreder, David I. Levine, Noah Novogrodsky, Portia Pedro, Beth Stephens, Susan Sturm
Charity Starr Ryerson
    Counsel of Record
Corporate Accountability Lab
6214 N. Glenwood Ave.
Chicago, IL 60660

charity@corpaccountabilitylab.org
3178507384
Party name: Human Rights Organizations
Peter Abraham Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

pnelson@pbwt.com
9174706163
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Alabama, American Civil Liberties Union of Florida, American Civil Liberties Union of Georgia, Center for Constitutional Rights, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Center for Justice and Accountability, Global Witness, Human Trafficking Legal Center, International Corporate Accountability Roundtable, LatinoJustice PRIDEF, and Lawyers For Civil Rights

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543