Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1566
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1566
Title:David Cassirer, et al., Petitioners
v.
Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Docketed:May 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55616)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
May 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
May 24 2021Response Requested. (Due June 23, 2021)
May 24 2021Brief amici curiae of 14 Professors of Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 23, 2021 to July 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2021.
Jul 29 2021Brief of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Reply of petitioners David Cassirer, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 30 2021Petition GRANTED.
Oct 14 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits denied.
Oct 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Cassirer, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Blanket Consent
Nov 15 2021Brief of petitioners David Cassirer, et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, January 18, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Nov 17 2021The record from the 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of The 1939 Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Brief amici curiae of B'nai B'rith International, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2021Amicus brief of B'nai B'rith International, Center for Art Law, Holocaust Survivors Foundation USA, Raoul Wallenberg Center for Human Rights, Omer Bartov, Michael Berenbaum, Donald S. Burris, Eugene J. Fisher, Rabbi Irving "Yitz' Greenberg, Peter Hayes, Michael J. Kelly, Marcia Sachs Littell, Wendy Lower, Carrie Menkel-Meadow, Miriam Friedman Morris, John Pawlikowski OSM, Carol Rittner RSM, John K. Roth, Jonathan Zatlin submitted.
Main Document
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Comunidad Judía de Madrid and Federación de Comunidades Judías de España filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mark B. Feldman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Boies
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
333 Main Street
Armonk, NY 10504

dboies@bsfllp.com
(914) 749-8200
Party name: David Cassirer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Erickson Andre
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 S. Grand Avenue
41st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

sandre@nixonpeabody.com
213-629-6076
Party name: Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Other
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Professors of Law
Bernardo Maria Cremades Roman
    Counsel of Record
B. Cremades y Asociados, S.L.
Calle Goya 18 (Floor 2)
Madrid (Spain), XX 28001

bcr@bcremades.com
+34 914237200
Party name: Comunidad Judía de Madrid and Federación de Comunidades Judías de España
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Cheri.Williams2@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: United States
Jennifer Anglim Kreder
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jennifer A. Kreder, PLLC
43 W. 43rd St Suite 81
New York, NY 10036

jen@jenniferkreder.com
12125181751
Party name: B'nai B'rith International, Center for Art Law, Holocaust Survivors Foundation USA, Raoul Wallenberg Center for Human Rights, Omer Bartov, Michael Berenbaum, Donald S. Burris, Eugene J. Fisher, Rabbi Irving "Yitz' Greenberg, Peter Hayes, Michael J. Kelly, Marcia Sachs Littell, Wendy Lower, Carrie Menkel-Meadow, Miriam Friedman Morris, John Pawlikowski OSM, Carol Rittner RSM, John K. Roth, Jonathan Zatlin
Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

nodonnell@sullivanlaw.com
617-338-2814
Party name: Mark B. Feldman
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: The 1939 Society, American Jewish Committee, Bet Tzedek, Center for the Study of Law & Genocide, and The Holocaust Education Center in the Desert, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543