Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1559
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1559
Title:Jamul Action Committee, et al., Petitioners
v.
E. Sequoyah Simermeyer, et al.
Docketed:May 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16655)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2021Waiver of right of respondents Raymond Hunter, Charlene Chamberlain, Robert Mesa, Richard Tellow, Julia Lotta, Penn National Inc., San Diego Gaming Ventures, and C.W. Driver to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kenneth Robert Williams
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
980 9th Street, 16th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95614

kenwilliams5165@gmail.com
(916) 449-9980
Party name: Jamul Action Committee, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Frank R. Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Frank Lawrence
578 Sutton Way, No. 246
Grass Valley, CA 95945

Frank@FrankLawrence.com
(530) 478-0703
Party name: Raymond Hunter, Charlene Chamberlain, Robert Mesa, Richard Tellow, Julia Lotta, Penn National Inc., San Diego Gaming Ventures, and C.W. Driver

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543