Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1552
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1552
Title:Naked TM, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Australian Therapeutic Supplies Pty. Ltd.
Docketed:May 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1567)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Jun 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis P. Derrick
    Counsel of Record
7 Winthrop Street
Essex, MA 01929-1203

dennisderrick@comcast.net
9787686610
Party name: NAKED TM LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543