Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1545
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1545
Title:TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al., Petitioners
v.
Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1
Docketed:May 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2215)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2021Brief of respondent Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from June 8, 2021 to June 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Response to motion from respondent Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari denied.
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 18 2021Reply of petitioners TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lionel Marks Lavenue
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
Two Freedom Square
Reston, VA 20190

lionel.lavenue@finnegan.com
571 203 2750
Party name: TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543