Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1541
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1541
Title:Pivotal Software, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, City and County of San Francisco, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2021
Linked with 20A164
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A162228)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 14, 2021
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Application (20A164) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 06 2021Response to application (20A164) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, May 12, by 4 p.m. ET.
May 07 2021Waiver of right of respondents Zhung Tran, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; and the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 11 2021Response Requested. (Due June 4, 2021)
May 12 2021Response to application from respondents Zhung Tran, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 13 2021Letter of applicants received.
May 13 2021Application (20A164) withdrawn.
Jun 02 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2021Brief of respondents Zhung Tran, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner Pivotal Software, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 15 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Pivotal Software, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, November 9, 2021.
Aug 16 2021Brief of petitioners Pivotal Software, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Zhung Tran, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 23 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Aug 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 27 2021Joint motion to hold further briefing in abeyance and remove the case from the November 2021 argument calendar filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the Court of Appeals of California First Appellate District..
Sep 02 2021The case is removed from the argument calendar for Tuesday, November 9, 2021, and the briefing schedule is held in abeyance. The parties are directed to provide further updates to the Court concerning settlement proceedings.
Sep 02 2021REMOVED from the November 2021 ARGUMENT CALENDAR.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: Pivotal Software, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Zhung Tran, et al.
Steve W. BermanHagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seeattle, WA 98101

steve@hbsslaw.com
206-623-7292
Party name: Zhung Tran, et al.
Other
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Society for Corporate Governance
William Michael Regan
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
390 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017

william.regan@hoganlovells.com
212 918 3060
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Eric Chunyee Tung
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 South Flower Street
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

etung@jonesday.com
(213) 489-3939
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543