Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1539
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1539
Title:Daniel Rivas-Villegas, Petitioner
v.
Ramon Cortesluna
Docketed:May 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15105)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021Brief amici curiae of California State Sheriffs' Assoc., California Police Chiefs Assoc., California Peace Officers' Assoc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent Ramon Cortesluna in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2021Reply of petitioner Daniel Rivas-Villegas filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition GRANTED. Determination of United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit that Rivas-Villegas is not entitled to qualified immunity REVERSED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
Nov 19 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Daniel Rivas-Villegas
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert George Howie
    Counsel of Record
Howie & Smith, LLP
1777 Borel Place, Suite 1000
San Mateo, CA 94402

showie@howielaw.com
6506859300
Party name: Ramon Cortesluna
Other
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
714-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Assoc., California Police Chiefs Assoc., California Peace Officers' Assoc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543