Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1536
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1536
Vide 20-1200
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:May 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1286)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2021Brief of respondent Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, on Behalf of Itself And All Others Similarly Situated in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
865 S. Figueroa St.
10th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(213) 443-3000
Party name: Common Ground Healthcare Cooperative, on Behalf of Itself And All Others Similarly Situated

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543