Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1531
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1531
Vide 20-1530, 20-1778, 20-1780
Title:The North American Coal Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:May 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1179)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The North American Coal Corporation
Blanket Consent
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021, for all respondents.
Jun 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Michael Regan, Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents States and Municipalities in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2021Reply of petitioner The North American Coal Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 29 2021Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 20-1530 and No. 20-1780 are granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-1778 is granted limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The motion of Lignite Energy Council for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in No. 20-1780 is granted. VIDED.
Nov 04 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1530. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1530. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: The North American Coal Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Michael Regan, Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, States and Municipalities
Steven Chiajon WuNew York Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

steven.wu@ag.ny.gov
2124166312
Party name: State of New York
Other
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543