Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1520
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1520
Vide 20-1678
Title:Diane Gruber, et al., Petitioners
v.
Oregon State Bar, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35470)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2021 to August 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2021.
Jun 24 2021Waiver of Oregon State Bar, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (June 25, 2021)
Jun 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Oregon State Bar, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Lawrence Spencer
    Counsel of Record
Michael L Spencer
403 Main St
Klamath Falls, OR 97601-0000

mlslaw@live.com
5418837137
Party name: Diane Gruber, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven M. Wilker
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

steven.wilker@tonkon.com
5038022040
Party name: Oregon State Bar, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543