Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1508
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1508
Title:Susan Pierson, Petitioner
v.
Hudson Insurance Company, et al.
Docketed:April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35185)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hudson Ins. Co., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Joseph Johnston
    Counsel of Record
401 Central Avenue
Bellingham, WA 98225

wjtj47@gmail.com
360-676-1931
Party name: Susan Pierson
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer P. MurrayMurray Dunham & Murray
P.O. Box 9844
Seattle, WA 98109

tammy@murraydunham.com
206-622-2655
Party name: Hudson Ins. Co., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543