Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1507
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1507
Title:Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3142)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
May 28 2021Waiver of right of respondents Gurbir S. Grewal, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Gun Owners of California and Second Amendment Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Arizona et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Waiver of right of respondent Thomas Williver, in his official capacity as Chief of Police Department to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 11 2021Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08625

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
609-376-2690
Party name: Gurbir S. Grewal, et al.
George C. JonesMcElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
1300 Mount Kemble Ave
P.O. Box 2075
Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

gjones@mdmc-law.com
973-993-8100
Party name: Thomas Williver, in his official capacity as Chief of Police Department
Other
Anna Marie Barvir
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 E. Ocean Blvd., Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

abarvir@michellawyers.com
(562) 216-4444
Party name: California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Gun Owners of California and Second Amendment Law Center
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office, Office of the Solicitor General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602)542-7751
Party name: State of Arizona
Craig Allen Livingston
    Counsel of Record
Linvingston Law Firm, P.C.
1600 South Main Street
Suite 280
Walnut Creek, CA 94596

clivingston@livingstonlawyers.com
(925) 952-9880
Party name: The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Cody James Wisniewski
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cody@mslegal.org
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543