Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1501
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1501
Title:Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, et al., Petitioners
v.
Shirin Emami, Acting Superintendent, New York Department of Financial Services, et al.
Docketed:April 27, 2021
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(529350)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 24, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2021 to June 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2021.
May 25 2021Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Eight Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of The Bruderhof, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2021 to August 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 23, 2021.
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondent Linda A. Lacewell; NY State Department of Financial Services in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Reply of petitioners Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Letter pursuant to Rule 35.3 of Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Fulton v. Philadelphia, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.
Dec 03 2021MANDATE ISSUED.
Dec 03 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Shirin Emami, Acting Superintendent, New York Department of Fincancial Services
Other
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
8643732352
Party name: the Bruderhof, the International Society for Krishna Consciousness, and the Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Institute for Religious Freedom
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Eight Legal Scholars
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
APT C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
954-328-9461
Party name: Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, and West Virginia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543