Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1485
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1485
Title:JoEllen Mary Crossett, Petitioner
v.
Emmet County, Michigan, et al.
Docketed:April 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1268)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 14 2021Brief of respondents Emmet County, MI; et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2021Reply of petitioner Joellen Mary Crossett filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 14 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
JoEllen Mary CrossettP.O. Box 142
Harbor Springs, MI 49740

(231) 758-6049
Party name: Joellen Mary Crossett
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas James Curlew
    Counsel of Record
Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, P.L.C.
17436 College Parkway
Livonia, MI 48152

dcurlew@cmda-law.com
734 261-2400
Party name: Emmet County, MI; et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543