Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-148
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-148
Title:Marvin Washington, et al., Petitioners
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:August 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-859)
   Decision Date:February 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendix
Sep 04 2020Brief amici curiae of The Minority Cannabis Business Association and Minorities for Medical Marijuana, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Safe Access filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Last Prisoner Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2020Amicus brief of Credo Science; American Journal of Endocannabinoid Medicine; Ethan Russo M.D.; Jahan Marcu Ph.d not accepted for filing. (September 14, 2020)
Sep 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent Barr, William, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Cannabis Industry Association (NCIA) And The Arcview Group filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Athletes for Care, After The Impact Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2020Brief amici curiae of US Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Reform of Marijuana Laws (NORML) et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of International Cannabis Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Credo Science; et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Amicus brief of National Organization for Reform of Marijuana Laws (NORML) et al not accepted for filing. (September 18, 2020) (Dupilicate submission)
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Steven Hiller
    Counsel of Record
Hiller, PC
641 Lexington Avenue, 29th Fl
New York, NY 10022

mhiller@hillerpc.com
6464085995
Party name: Marvin Washington, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William, et al.
Other
Joseph Edward Collins
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
321 N Clark St, Suite 1600
Chicago, IL 60654

jcollins@foxrothschild.com
3129531941
Party name: The Minority Cannabis Business Association and Minorities for Medical Marijuana, Inc.
Michael B. de Leeuw
    Counsel of Record
Cozen O'Connor
45 Broadway Atrium
New York, NY 10006

mdeleeuw@cozen.com
(212) 908-1331
Party name: US Representatives
David Clifford Holland
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David Clifford Holland, P.C.
201 East 28th Street - Suite 2R
New York, NY 10016

DCH@HollandLitigation.com
2128422480
Party name: National Organization for Reform of Marijuana Laws (NORML) et al
David Corey Kotler
    Counsel of Record
Hoban Law Group
730 17th Street
Suite 420
Denver, CO 80202

davidk@hoban.law
3036747000
Party name: Credo Science; American Journal of Endocannabinoid Medicine; Ethan Russo M.D.; Jahan Marcu Ph.d
Anthony J. Mellaci Jr.
    Counsel of Record
ANSELL GRIMM & AARON, P.C.
1500 Lawrence Avenue
Ocean, NJ 07712

ajm@ansellgrimm.com
732-922-1000
Party name: Athletes for Care, After The Impact Fund, Canna Research Foundation, NFL Sisters In Service, Inc., and Isiah International, LLC
Melissa Aniela Murphy-Petros
    Counsel of Record
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman and Dicker
55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3800
Chicago, IL 60603

melissa.murphy-petros@wilsonelser.com
312-704-0550
Party name: The National Cannabis Industry Association (NCIA) And The Arcview Group
Robert M. Palumbos
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmpalumbos@duanemorris.com
215-979-1111
Party name: International Cannabis Bar Association
Brett M. Schuman
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

BSchuman@goodwinlaw.com
415 733 6021
Party name: Americans for Safe Access
Gary P. Weinstein
    Counsel of Record
Gary Weinstein
330 Washington St.
PMB #368
Hoboken, NJ 07030

gpw2@cornell.edu
551-208-2447
Party name: The Last Prisoner Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543