SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1474
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1474
Title:
Joseph Colone, Petitioner
v.
Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Docketed:
April 20, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
Case Numbers:
(A160989)
Decision Date:
October 21, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 13, 2021
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 04 2021
Waiver of right of respondent GitHub, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 20 2021
Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars and Scientists filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 20 2021
Brief amici curiae of The National Association for Public Defense, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 25 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 07 2021
Response Requested. (Due July 7, 2021)
Jun 09 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 7, 2021 to August 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 10 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2021.
Aug 06 2021
Brief of respondent GitHub, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 23 2021
Reply of petitioner Joseph Colone filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Aug 25 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erwin Chemerinsky
Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720
echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Joseph Colone
Attorneys for Respondents
Alexander Adelman Berengaut
Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001
aberengaut@cov.com
2026625367
Party name: GitHub, Inc.
Other
Samia Fam
Counsel of Record
Public Defender Service
633 Indiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004
sfam@pdsdc.org
2026281200
Party name: The National Association for Public Defense, et al.
Mary-Christine Sungaila
Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612
msungaila@buchalter.com
9497601121
Party name: Legal Scholars and Scientists
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##