Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1472
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1472
Title:Boechler, P.C., Petitioner
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:April 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2003)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
May 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Tax Clinic at Charles Widger School of Law et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2021 to July 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 22, 2021.
Jul 22 2021Brief of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Reply of petitioner Boechler, P.C. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 30 2021Petition GRANTED.
Nov 15 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Brief of petitioner Boechler, P.C. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, January 12, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Tax Clinics, Legal Aid Groups, and Tax Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of The Center for Taxpayer Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Amicus brief of A. Lavar Taylor not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (December 01, 2021)
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of A. Lavar Taylor filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Boechler, P.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Federal Tax Clinic at Charles Widger School of Law and The Seton Hall Center for Social Justice Impact Litigation Clinic
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Federal Tax Clinics, Legal Aid Groups, and Tax Professors
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation, et al.,
Carlton M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
255 W. 23rd Street
#4AW
New York, NY 10011

carltonsmth@aol.com
6462301776
Party name: The Center for Taxpayer Rights and the National Consumer Law Center
A. Lavar Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of A. Lavar Taylor, LLP
3 Hutton Centre Drive
Suite 500
Santa Ana, CA 92707

ltaylor@taylorlaw.com
714-546-0445
Party name: A. Lavar Taylor
Carlton M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
255 W. 23rd Street
#4AW
New York, NY 10011

carltonsmth@aol.com
6462301776
Party name: The Center for Taxpayer Rights

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543