Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1468
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1468
Title:Robert David Dupuch-Carron, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Docketed:April 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1137)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
Jun 21 2021Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2021Reply of petitioners Robert David Dupuch-Carron, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Curtis R. Webb
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Curtis R. Webb
7495 Westview Lane
P.O. Box 429
Monmouth, OR 97361

crwebb@mindspring.com
5412318971
Party name: Robert David Dupuch-Carron, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Becerra, Xavier

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543