Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1462
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1462
Title:Eni USA Gas Marketing LLC, Petitioner
v.
Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al.
Docketed:April 19, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Delaware
   Case Numbers:(22, 2020)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 10 2021Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2021)
Jul 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 12, 2021 to August 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 11, 2021.
Aug 11 2021Brief of respondents Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph J. LoBue
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

JLobue@sheppardmullin.com
2027471936
Party name: Eni USA Gas Marketing LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543