Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1452
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1452
Vide 20-1284
Title:Rick C. Sasso, Petitioner
v.
Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1583)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2021Brief of respondents Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 25 2021Reply of petitioner Rick C. Sasso filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George Thomas Patton Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bose, McKinney & Evans
777 6th Street, N.W.
Suite 520
Washington, DC 20001

gpatton@boselaw.com
(202) 470-1944
Party name: Rick C. Sasso
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543