Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1426
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1426
Title:Epic Systems Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Tata Consultancy Services Limited, et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1528, 19-1613)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2021 to June 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 11, 2021.
Jun 11 2021Brief of respondent Tata Consultancy Services Limited & Tata America International Corporation (d/b/a TCS America) in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2021Reply of petitioner Epic Systems Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael T. Brody
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

MBrody@jenner.com
312-923-2711
Party name: Epic Systems Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8270
Party name: Tata Consultancy Services Limited & Tata America International Corporation (d/b/a TCS America)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543