Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1380
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1380
Title:Security People, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Docketed:April 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2118)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary Of Commerce For Intellectual Property And Director Of The United States Patent And Trademark Office; United States Patent And Trademark Office to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frear Stephen Schmid
    Counsel of Record
7585 Valley Ford Road
Petaluma, CA 94952

frearschmid@aol.com
415-788-5957
Party name: Security People, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary Of Commerce For Intellectual Property And Director Of The United States Patent And Trademark Office; United States Patent And Trademark Office

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543