Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1378
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1378
Title:Linda Rizzo-Rupon, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO District 141, Local 914, et al.
Docketed:April 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1106)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2021)
AppendixPetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2021 to June 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 2, 2021, for all respondents.
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO District 141 Local 914, et al. in support filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 14 2021Reply of petitioners Linda Rizzo-Rupon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center for Public Policy
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wright@mackinac.org
9894303912
Party name: Linda Rizzo-Rupon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth Ann Roma
    Counsel of Record
Guerrieri, Bartos & Roma, PC
1900 M Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

eroma@geclaw.com
202-624-7400
Party name: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO District 141 Local 914, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543