Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1374
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1374
Title:CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
John Doe, One, et al.
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15074)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2021 to June 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2021.
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021Brief of respondents John Doe One, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Reply of petitioners CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 14 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2021.
Jul 22 2021Suggestion of death and motion to substitute Richard Roe, authorized representative, as a respondent in place of John Doe Two, Deceased filed by respondents.
Main Document
Aug 23 2021Motion to substitute Richard Roe, authorized representative, as a respondent in place of John Doe Two, Deceased GRANTED.
Aug 30 2021Suggestion of death and motion to substitute John Doe Four, authorized representative, as a respondent in place of John Doe Three, Deceased filed by respondents.
Main Document
Sep 03 2021Brief of petitioners CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of the District of Columbia, et al., in support of neither party.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 7, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gerald Sinclair Flanagan
    Counsel of Record
Consumer Watchdog
6330 San Vicente Blvd., Suite 250
Los Angeles, CA 90048

jerry@consumerwatchdog.org
3103920522
Party name: John Doe One, et al.
Other
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: The District of Columbia and 17 states
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Cato Institute
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
(202) 261-3300
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
John Savage Moran
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jmoran@mcguirewoods.com
(202) 828-2817
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Dept. of Justice
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
(225) 326-6766
Party name: States of Louisiana, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543