Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1372
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1372
Title:John Chambers, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Thirteenth District
   Case Numbers:(13-16-00079-CR)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 16, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2021Brief of respondent State of Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 07 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Torrey Hunter
    Counsel of Record
Hunter, Lane & Jampala
310 S. St. Mary's Street
Suite 1740
San Antonio, TX 78205

jth753@gmail.com
2102021076
Party name: John Chambers
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Benjamin Katz
    Counsel of Record
Cameron County District Attorney's Office
964 E. Harrison St.
Brownsville, TX 78520

samuel.katz@co.cameron.tx.us
(956) 544-0849
Party name: State of Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543