Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1364
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1364
Title:BofI Holding, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Docketed:March 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55415)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
Apr 28 2021Response Requested. (Due May 28, 2021)
Apr 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 28, 2021 to June 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2021Brief of BofI Holding, Inc., et al. in opposition submitted.
Main Document
May 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2021.
Jun 25 2021Brief of respondent Houston Municipal Employees Pension System in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John P. Stigi III
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter and Hampton LLP
1901 Avenue of the Stars
16th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

jstigi@sheppardmullin.com
(310) 228-3717
Party name: BofI Holding, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Richard Martin HeimannLieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein, LLP
275 Battery Street
29th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

RHEIMANN@lchb.com
(415) 956-1000
Party name: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Other
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124553539
Party name: Financial Markets Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543