Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1363
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1363
Vide 20-773
Title:Merit Medical Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Nazir Khan, et al.
Docketed:March 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1952, 2019-2394)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2021Brief of respondents Nazir Khan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Reply of petitioner Merit Medical Systems, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David R. Todd
    Counsel of Record
Workman Nydegger
60 East South Temple, Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

dtodd@wnlaw.com
801-533-9800
Party name: Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan Alan Herstoff
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Nazir Khan, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543