Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1362
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1362
Title:Davdrin Goffin, Petitioner
v.
Robbie K. Ashcraft, et al.
Docketed:March 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1430)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2021Waiver of right of respondent Robbie Ashcraft to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021Brief amici curiae of DC Justice Lab, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 12 2021Response Requested. (Due June 11, 2021)
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
Jul 12 2021Brief of respondent Robbie Ashcraft in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 25 2021Reply of petitioner Davdrin Goffin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
Washington University in St. Louis School of Law
One Brookings Drive
Box 1120
St. Louis, MO 63130

dharawa@wustl.edu
3149354689
Party name: Davdrin Goffin
Attorneys for Respondents
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Robbie Ashcraft
Jenna Allison AdamsArkansas Municipal League
P.O. Box 38
North Little Rock, AR 72115

jenadams@arml.org
5019786115
Party name: Robbie Ashcraft
Other
Mae Catherine Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Youth Justice Clinic
University of District of Columbia - David A. Clarke School of Law
4340 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20008

mae.quinn@udc.edu
202-274-5073
Party name: DC Justice Lab, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543