Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1354
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1354
Title:City of Portland, Oregon, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-72689, 19-70490, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147 19-70326, 19-70339, 19-70341, 19-70344)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2021 to May 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2021, for all respondents.
Apr 26 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Brief of respondent International Municipal Lawyers Association in support of the petition filed. (Docket entry corrected 5/20/21)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Waiver of City of Portland, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (May 11, 2021)
May 12 2021Waiver of right of respondents City of Austin, Texas, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2021 to June 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 2, 2021, for all respondents.
May 25 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondents Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent CTIA -- The Wireless Association in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 15 2021Reply of petitioners City of Portland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph Van Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger
1800 K Street Suite 725
Washington DC, DC 20006

joseph.vaneaton@bbklaw.com
202-785-0600
Party name: City of Portland, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gerard Lavery Lederer
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger LLP
1800 K Street N.W., Suite 725
Washington, DC 20006

gerard.lederer@bbklaw.com
202-785-0600
Party name: City of Austin, Texas, et al.
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
Intellectual Property & Technology Law Clinic, University of Southern California Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90089

jef@law.usc.edu
(213) 740-7613
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Thomas Scott Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
701 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20004

sthompson@mintz.com
202-434-7440
Party name: The Wireless Infrastructure Association
Joshua S. Turner
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washinton, DC 20006

jturner@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: CTIA -- The Wireless Association
Other
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law Appellate Advocacy Clinic
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: National Association of Counties, U.S. Conference of Mayors, Government Finance Officers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543