Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-135
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-135
Title:Customedia Technologies, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Dish Network Corporation, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1001)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Customedia Technologies., LLC
Blanket Consent
Sep 08 2020Waiver of right of respondent Dish Network Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition DENIED.
Nov 06 2020Petition of Customedia Technologies., LLC for rehearing not accepted for filing. (November 17, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raymond William Mort III
    Counsel of Record
The Mort Law Firm, PLLC
100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000
Austin, TX 78701

raymort@austinlaw.com
512-865-7950
Party name: Customedia Technologies., LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Eliot D. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112

eliot.williams@bakerbotts.com
6507397511
Party name: Dish Network Corporation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543