Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1339
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1339
Title:Richard Sowinski, Petitioner
v.
California Air Resources Board
Docketed:March 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1558)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2021 to May 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 24, 2021.
May 24 2021Brief of respondent California Air Resources Board in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Jun 10 2021Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Richard Sowinski
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: California Air Resources Board

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543