Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1334
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1334
Title:Bradley Boardman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington, et al.
Docketed:March 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35113)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Bradley Boardman, a Washington Individual Provider, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Allied Daily Newspapers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Waiver of right of respondents Jay R. Inslee, Governor of the State of Washington, et al. (except Campaign To Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors) to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Campaign to Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Fairness Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Bronx Household of Faith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the 1st filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Utah, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, and West Virginia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Citizen Action Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; Illinois Policy Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center of the American Experiment filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
Apr 29 2021Response Requested. (Due June 1, 2021)
May 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2021 to July 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2021, for all respondents.
Jul 01 2021Brief of respondents Jay R. Inslee, Governor of the State of Washington, et al. (except Campaign To Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors) in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2021Brief of respondent Campaign to Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 21 2021Reply of petitioners Bradley Boardman, a Washington Individual Provider, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Bradley Boardman, a Washington Individual Provider, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Campaign to Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Jay R. Inslee, Governor of the State of Washington, et al. (except Campaign To Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors)
Gregory J. WongPacifica Law Group
1191 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98101

Greg.Wong@pacificalawgroup.com
2062451700
Party name: Campaign to Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors
Other
James Vincent Francis Dickey
    Counsel of Record
Upper Midwest Law Center
8421 Wayzata Blvd., Suite 105
Golden Valley, MN 55426

james.dickey@umwlc.org
612-428-7002
Party name: Center of the American Experiment
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Frank Dawson Garrison IV
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

fdg@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square, Suite 2000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@faegredrinker.com
215-988-3364
Party name: The Bronx Household of Faith
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Office of the Attorney General
350 N. State Street,
Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Utah, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, and West Virginia
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Illinois Policy Institute
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation and Pelican Institute for Public Policy
James Elliot Lobsenz
    Counsel of Record
701 Fifth Avenue
Suite 3600
Seattle, WA 98104

lobsenz@carneylaw.com
206-622-8020
Party name: Allied Daily Newspapers
Nathan John McGrath
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street
Suite 600B
Harrisburg, PA 17101

njmcgrath@fairnesscenter.org
844.293.1001
Party name: The Fairness Center
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jackparklaw@gmail.com
470-892-6444
Party name: Buckeye Institute
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the 1st
Andrew Ryan Stokesbary
    Counsel of Record
Citizen Action Defense Fund
1003 Main Street, Suite 5
Sumner, WA 98390

drew@citizenactiondefense.org
206-486-0795
Party name: Citizen Action Defense Fund
Patrick J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center for Public Policy
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wright@mackinac.org
9894303912
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543