Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1313
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1313
Title:Dimitri Shivkov, et al., Petitioners
v.
Artex Risk Solutions, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16746)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021, for all respondents.
May 21 2021Brief of respondents Artex Risk Solutions, Inc.,, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioners Dimitri Shivkov, Individually and as a Trustee of the Phoenix 2010 Revocable Trust, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David R. Deary
    Counsel of Record
Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon, LLP
12377 Merit Drive
Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75251

davidd@ldsrlaw.com
214-572-1700
Party name: Dimitri Shivkov, Individually and as a Trustee of the Phoenix 2010 Revocable Trust, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-5600
Party name: Artex Risk Solutions, Inc.,, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543