Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1312
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1312
Title:Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, Petitioner
v.
Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center
Docketed:March 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35845, 18-35872)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 19, 2021.
May 19 2021Brief of respondent Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Reply of petitioner Becerra, Xavier, Secretary of Health and Human Services filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 19 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Brief of petitioner Becerra, Xavier, Secretary of Health and Human Services filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 29, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Becerra, Xavier, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel J. Hettich
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

DHettichAppeals@kslaw.com
(202) 626-9128
Party name: Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center
Anne Margaret VoigtsKing & Spalding LLP
601 S. California Ave., Ste. 100
Los Altos, CA 94024

avoigts@kslaw.com
(650) 422-6710
Party name: Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center
Other
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543