Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1294
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1294
Title:Simon Campbell, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pennsylvania School Boards Association, et al.
Docketed:March 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3112)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021.
Apr 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2021Brief of respondents Pennsylvania School Boards Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners Simon Campbell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Simon Campbell, et al.
Jacob Charles CohnGordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
Three Logan Square
1717 Arch St., Ste 610
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jcohn@grsm.com
2157174004
Party name: Simon Campbell, et al.
Other
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Institute for Free Speech

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543