Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1282
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1282
Title:In Re Kaysha F. N. Dery, Petitioner
Docketed:March 17, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2020Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
Petition
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kaysha F.N. Dery1292 95th Street
North Battleford
SK S9A 0G2, XX CANADA

306-441-7010
Party name: Kaysha F.N. Dery

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543