Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1271
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1271
Title:Daryl R. Blanton, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:March 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2009)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent Denis McDonough, Sec. of VA to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth M. Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Carpenter, Chartered
1525 SW Topeka Boulevard, Suite D
Topeka, KS 66601

kmcarpenter@mindspring.com
(785) 357-5251
Party name: Daryl Blanton
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis McDonough, Sec. of VA

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543