Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1259
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1259
Title:Protect Our Parks, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Chicago, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:March 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2308, 19-3333)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Waiver of right of respondent City of Chicago to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Chicago Park District to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Rachlis
    Counsel of Record
Rachlis Durham Duff and Adler.LLC
542 South Dearborn
Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60605

mrachlis@rdaplaw.net
3127333955
Party name: Protect Our Parks, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
2 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 580
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: The City of Chicago
Joseph P. RoddyBurke, Warren, MacKay & Serritella, P.C.
330 N. Wabash Avenue, 21st Floor
Chicago, IL 60611

jroddy@bukelaw.com
312-840-7033
Party name: Chicago Park District

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543