Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1243
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1243
Title:Staci Burk, Petitioner
v.
Doug Ducey, Governor of Arizona, et al.
Docketed:March 10, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CV-20-0349-AP/EL)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Ducey, Gov. of AZ, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Staci Burk2487 S. Gilbert #106-609
Gilbert, AZ 85295

(480) 343-4518
Party name: Staci Burk
Attorneys for Respondents
Brett William Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.
400 E. Van Buren
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bwjohnson@swlaw.com
602-382-6312
Party name: Ducey, Gov. of AZ, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543