Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1235
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1235
Title:Burgoyne, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Chicago Terminal Railroad Company, et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2021
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, First District
   Case Numbers:(1-19-0098)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 30, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent City of Chicago to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George S. Bellas
    Counsel of Record
Bellas & Wachowski
15 N. Northwest Highway
Park Ridge, IL 60068

george@bellas-wachowski.com
847-823-9032
Party name: Burgoyne, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
2 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 580
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: City of Chicago

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543