Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1227
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1227
Title:David Louis Whitehead, Petitioner
v.
Netflix, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55905)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Louis Whitehead1906 Scott Street
Bossier, LA 71111

(318) 820-5029
Party name: David Louis Whitehead

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543