Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1223
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1223
Title:Johnson & Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gail L. Ingham, et al.
Docketed:March 4, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(ED107476)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 3, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Johnson & Johnson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Gail L. Ingham, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2021 to May 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 5, 2021.
Apr 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of the Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Tort Reform Association, National Association of Manufacturers, Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., American Property Casualty Insurance Association, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufac filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Missouri Organization of Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Brief amici curiae of Abubakar Atiq Durrani, M.D., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2021Brief of respondents Gail L. Ingham, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Women's Health Network in support of respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 4, 2021 to May 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 11, 2021 granted.
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 11 2021Reply of petitioners Johnson & Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Alito and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Johnson & Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth Winston Starr
    Counsel of Record
The Lanier Law Firm, PC
10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N.
Suite 100
Houston, TX 77064

ken.starr@lanierlawfirm.com
713.659.5200
Party name: Gail L. Ingham, et al.
Thomas C. GoldsteinGoldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Gail L. Ingham, et al.
Other
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: National Women's Health Network
Lisa Marie Baird
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1001 Brickell Bay Drive
Miami, FL 33131

lbaird@reedsmith.com
786-747-0200
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Gray Thomas Culbreath
    Counsel of Record
Gallivan, White and Boyd
1201 Main Street
Suite 1200 (29201)
Columbia, SC 29202

gculbreath@gwblawfirm.com
803-724-1850
Party name: the Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel
Douglas Webber Dunham
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

douglas.dunham@dechert.com
212-698-3500
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
David R. Geiger
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
Seaport West
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210-2600

dgeiger@foleyhoag.com
6178321124
Party name: The Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Eric G. Lasker
    Counsel of Record
Hollingsworth LLP
1350 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

elasker@hollingsworthllp.com
202-898-5843
Party name: The International Association of Defense Counsel
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
3703 Watson Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63109

reeves@reeveslawstl.com
3147756985
Party name: Missouri Organization of Defense Lawyers
Evan Mark Tager
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

etager@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Tort Reform Association, National Association of Manufacturers, Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., American Property Casualty Insurance Association, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, and Business Roundtable
Philip Daniel Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pwilliamson@taftlaw.com
(513) 381-2838
Party name: Abubakar Atiq Durrani, M.D., and Center for Advanced Spine Technologies

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543