Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1214
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1214
Title:Fred J. Eychaner, Petitioner
v.
City of Chicago, Illinois
Docketed:March 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, First District
   Case Numbers:(1-19-1053)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 30, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent City of Chicago, Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 15 2021Response Requested. (Due April 14, 2021)
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2021.
Apr 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kosta Stanko Stojilkovic
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
2001 M Street NW, 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

kstojilkovic@wilkinsonstekloff.com
(202) 847-4045
Party name: Fred J. Eychaner
Attorneys for Respondent
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
2 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 580
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: City of Chicago, Illinois
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Claremont Institute
1317 W. Foothill Blvd., Ste 120
Upland, CA 91786

tcaso@claremont.org
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

bth@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
(312) 637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Law Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543